NY A09968 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8907
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8907
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the operation of a youth services unit within the port authority police department tasked with aiding youths in danger of exploitation.
Title
Relates to the operation of a youth services unit within the port authority police department tasked with aiding youths in danger of exploitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s8907 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.569 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08907 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.195