NY A09967 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that postdoctoral general practice or specialty dental residency program experience required for licensure as a dentist needs to be clinically-based.
Title
Removes the requirement that postdoctoral general practice or specialty dental residency program experience required for licensure as a dentist needs to be clinically-based.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Assembly | signed chap.613 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1246 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8808 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.638 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08808 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9967