NY A09958 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the possession, manufacture, transport and disposition of trigger modification devices; exemptions.
Title
Prohibits the possession, manufacture, transport and disposition of trigger modification devices; exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.12 |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.12 |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08719 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO CODES