NY A09951 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms a transportation contract of the Fulton city school district.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms a transportation contract of the Fulton city school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | tabled |
2020-11-11 | Senate | vetoed memo.58 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1018 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7775 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.104 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.104 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07775 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - tabled