NY A09943 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - signed chap.464
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the provision of municipal advanced life support first responder service or municipal ambulance service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the provision of municipal advanced life support first responder service or municipal ambulance service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.464
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1438
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7013C
2012-06-19SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-19Senatereturned to senate
2012-06-19Assemblyrepassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 9943c
2012-06-14Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2012-06-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-14Senaterecalled from senate
2012-06-12SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-01Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.711
2012-05-31Assemblyreported
2012-05-22Assemblyprint number 9943b
2012-05-22Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2012-05-01Assemblyprint number 9943a
2012-05-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2012-04-26Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S07013 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9943C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09943&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09943&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09943
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09943&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09943A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09943&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09943B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09943&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09943C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09943&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A9943#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback