NY A09938 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of education to promulgate regulations to include school mental health practitioners in a certificate valid for pupil personnel services.
Title
Requires the commissioner of education to promulgate regulations to include school mental health practitioners in a certificate valid for pupil personnel services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | print number 9938a |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2016-04-29 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07611 (Same As) 2016-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 7611A