NY A09934 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - 3RD READING CAL.568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - 3RD READING CAL.568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets forth conditions when an agency shall enter into a contract for consultant services.
Title
Relates to contracts by state agencies for consultant services; defines "state agencies" and "consultant services"; provides that no state agency shall enter into a contract for consultant services which is anticipated to cost more than five hundred thousand dollars in a twelve month period unless such state agency has first conducted a review to determine whether state employees can practicably meet the same need by providing services of the same or better quality for equivalent or lower costs; provides exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | 3RD READING CAL.568 | |
2010-06-23 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7011 | |
2010-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2010-05-27 | advanced to third reading cal.956 | |
2010-05-24 | reported | |
2010-03-09 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-02-12 | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S7011 (Same As) 2010-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9934