NY A09933 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of a wage data clearinghouse to assist in the effective collection, organization, management, aggregation or disaggregation and analysis of available wage, employment and education released data and the examination of student progress and outcomes over time, as well as the effectiveness of workforce preparation programs.
Title
Relates to the establishment of a wage data clearinghouse to assist in the effective collection, organization, management, aggregation or disaggregation and analysis of available wage, employment and education released data and the examination of student progress and outcomes over time, as well as the effectiveness of workforce preparation programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.296 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | print number 9933a |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08003 (Same As) 2016-06-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR