NY A09929 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - signed chap.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - signed chap.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making an appropriation to pay Debra Gordon, widow of the late William R. Nojay, member of the assembly from the one hundred thirty-third assembly district, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2016.
Title
Relates to making an appropriation to pay Debra Gordon, widow of the late William R. Nojay, member of the assembly from the one hundred thirty-third assembly district, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | signed chap.75 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1559 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7787 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.1027 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07787 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9929