NY A09928 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - signed chap.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to making an appropriation to pay Jennifer Simanowitz, widow of the late Michael A. Simanowitz, member of the assembly from the twenty-seventh assembly district, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to making an appropriation to pay Jennifer Simanowitz, widow of the late Michael A. Simanowitz, member of the assembly from the twenty-seventh assembly district, the balance due of his unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2017.

Sponsors

Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]
Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]
Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. William Colton [D]
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]
Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Addie Jenne [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. William Magee [D]
Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Joseph Morelle [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Robin Schimminger [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D]
Asm. Frank Skartados [D]Asm. James Skoufis [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Matthew Titone [D]
Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25Senatesigned chap.74
2018-06-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1627
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7788
2018-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1026
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-02-23Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07788 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9928

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback