NY A09928 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - approval memo.21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - approval memo.21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a person licensed to practice acupuncture in another state to practice acupuncture in New York in certain cases.
Title
Permits a person licensed to practice acupuncture in another state to practice acupuncture in New York in certain cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | approval memo.21 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.504 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1570 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7778 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.110 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.110 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07778 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9928