NY A09922 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to publishing local campaign contribution limits.
Title
Relates to publishing local campaign contribution limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.816 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-23 | Assembly | referred to election law |