NY A09921 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to testimony related to voter's signature on a petition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to testimony related to voter's signature on a petition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.113
2018-06-12Assemblyrules report cal.113
2018-06-11Assemblyreported
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-25Assemblyprint number 9921a
2018-05-25Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2018-02-23Assemblyreferred to election law

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09921&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09921&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09921
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09921&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09921A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09921&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09921&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09921&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback