NY A09902 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - approval memo.8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - approval memo.8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies the early childhood advisory council to promote a comprehensive and high quality early childhood system.
Title
Codifies the early childhood advisory council to promote a comprehensive and high quality early childhood system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | approval memo.8 |
2016-11-04 | Senate | signed chap.415 |
2016-10-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1647 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7427A |
2016-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9902a |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.626 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S07427 (Same As) 2016-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9902A