NY A09890 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the residency requirement for the court attendant for the town of Somers in the county of Westchester.
Title
Relates to the residency requirement for the court attendant for the town of Somers in the county of Westchester.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.927 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07761 (Same As) 2018-02-20 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT