NY A09878 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Capital District transportation authority to enter into an agreement with any city, town or village located within the Capital District transportation district which has adopted an ordinance regulating the registration and licensing of taxicab vehicles; and authorizes any city, town or village located within the Capital District transportation district to contract with the Capital District transportation authority for certain purposes.
Title
Authorizes the Capital District transportation authority to enter into an agreement with any city, town or village located within the Capital District transportation district which has adopted an ordinance regulating the registration and licensing of taxicab vehicles; and authorizes any city, town or village located within the Capital District transportation district to contract with the Capital District transportation authority for certain purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Senate | signed chap.258 |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1953 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7359A |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.239 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.239 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | print number 9878a |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07359 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9878A