NY A09862 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8775
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8775
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain elected officials in the town of Clarkson, in the county of Monroe, who failed to take or file their respective oaths of office for the three-year term beginning January 1, 2020 to continue serving in their respective capacities provided they take and file their oaths of office within thirty days from the effective date.
Title
Allows certain elected officials in the town of Clarkson, in the county of Monroe, who failed to take or file their respective oaths of office for the three-year term beginning January 1, 2020 to continue serving in their respective capacities provided they take and file their oaths of office within thirty days from the effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8775 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.720 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08775 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.457