NY A09861 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mitigating the closure of the L subway line in the city of New York; directs the MTA in consultation with other relevant entities to develop a plan to mitigate the individual and economic hardships due to the L subway line closure; establishes a temporary high-occupancy vehicle program on the Williamsburg bridge by means of mobile or stationary photo devices.
Title
Relates to mitigating the closure of the L subway line in the city of New York; directs the MTA in consultation with other relevant entities to develop a plan to mitigate the individual and economic hardships due to the L subway line closure; establishes a temporary high-occupancy vehicle program on the Williamsburg bridge by means of mobile or stationary photo devices.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] | Asm. Maritza Davila [D] | Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] |
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.281 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.281 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | print number 9861c |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | print number 9861b |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 9861a |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08052 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 8052C