NY A09851 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.240
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain property from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a church.
Title
Exempts certain property from the prohibition of alcohol sales within a certain distance from a church.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.240 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1082 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7943 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.814 |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07943 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9851