NY A09845 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - approval memo.21
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires insurers to perform a comparison of life insurance policies against the federal Death Master File to identify potential matches of its insureds or account holders and to complete a good faith effort to confirm the death of the insured and locate beneficiaries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires insurers to perform a comparison of life insurance policies against the federal Death Master File to identify potential matches of its insureds or account holders and to complete a good faith effort to confirm the death of the insured and locate beneficiaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senateapproval memo.21
2012-12-17Senatesigned chap.495
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.997
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6943A
2012-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyamended on third reading 9845b
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.215
2012-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.215
2012-06-14Assemblyreported
2012-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-08Assemblyprint number 9845a
2012-06-08Assemblyamend and recommit to insurance
2012-04-18Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S06943 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9845B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09845&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09845&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09845
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09845&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09845A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09845&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09845B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09845&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A9845#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback