NY A09833 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.455
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to extending provisions of law relating to the repair of damaged pesticide containers; extends such date to July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to extending provisions of law relating to the repair of damaged pesticide containers; extends such date to July 1, 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.455
2020-02-25Assemblyreported
2020-02-19Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback