NY A09826 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - advanced to third reading cal.729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - advanced to third reading cal.729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the board of elections shall transfer a registration and enrollment of a voter to wherever they move in the state, even if the voter moves to a new county.
Title
Provides that the board of elections shall transfer a registration and enrollment of a voter to wherever they move in the state, even if the voter moves to a new county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.729 |
2018-03-27 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01732 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS