NY A09820 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "minority group member" for purposes of participation by minority group members and women with respect to state contracts.
Title
Expands the definition of "minority group member" for purposes of participation by minority group members and women with respect to state contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.883 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07858 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE