NY A09815 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-14 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions permitting rent increases after vacancy of a housing accommodation.
Title
Repeals provisions permitting rent increases after vacancy of a housing accommodation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.706 |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S01593 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT