NY A09808 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the trustees of the freeholders and commonalty of the towns of Southampton, East Hampton and Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of section 72-h of the general municipal law.
Title
Includes the trustees of the freeholders and commonalty of the towns of Southampton, East Hampton and Southold as municipal corporations for the purposes of section 72-h of the general municipal law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.581 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.581 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | print number 9808a |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2012-04-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06917 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES