NY A09802 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - print number 9802b
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - print number 9802b
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a program to address the legalization of specified basements and cellars and the conversion of other specified basements and cellars in a city with a population of one million or more.
Title
Establishes a program to address the legalization of specified basements and cellars and the conversion of other specified basements and cellars in a city with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | print number 9802b |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | print number 9802a |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08783 (Same As) 2022-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 8783B