NY A09795 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting the Candor central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Relates to permitting the Candor central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8706 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.718 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08706 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.338