NY A09792 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8689b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8689b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Gurudwara Shaheedan, Inc. with respect to the 2019-2020 assessment roll for a portion of the 2020 general taxes and the 2020-2021 assessment roll for all of the 2020-2021 school taxes and all of the 2021 general taxes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Gurudwara Shaheedan, Inc. with respect to the 2019-2020 assessment roll for a portion of the 2020 general taxes and the 2020-2021 assessment roll for all of the 2020-2021 school taxes and all of the 2021 general taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8689b |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.716 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | print number 9792b |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 9792a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2022-04-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08689 (Same As) 2022-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.631