NY A09786 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9354
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds Black Meadow Creek to the definition of inland waterways.
Title
Adds Black Meadow Creek to the definition of inland waterways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9354 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.714 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S09354 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.352