NY A09775 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8864
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s8864
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Selden Fire District with respect to the 2021-2022 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk, to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Selden Fire District with respect to the 2021-2022 assessment roll.
Sponsors
Asm. Doug Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s8864 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.630 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08864 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.462