NY A09763 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.51
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an association representing motor vehicles engaged in the business of carrying or transporting passengers for-hire, having a seating capacity of not less than eight passengers, to create and implement a comprehensive educational program designed to advance for-hire motor vehicle safety and provide such training; allows for a reduction in rates of certain commercial risk insurance premiums for motor vehicles upon completion of such course; authorizes the superintendent of financial services to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes an association representing motor vehicles engaged in the business of carrying or transporting passengers for-hire, having a seating capacity of not less than eight passengers, to create and implement a comprehensive educational program designed to advance for-hire motor vehicle safety and provide such training; allows for a reduction in rates of certain commercial risk insurance premiums for motor vehicles upon completion of such course; authorizes the superintendent of financial services to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.51 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.347 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.832 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7881 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.471 |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | print number 9763a |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07881 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - approval memo.51