NY A09762 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - signed chap.243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-18 - signed chap.243
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes awards for burial expenses of crime victims to be paid to a business.
Title
Authorizes awards for burial expenses of crime victims to be paid to a business.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | Senate | signed chap.243 |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1578 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7191 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.714 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07191 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9762