NY A09750 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the minimum cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs; removes the minimum 3.0 or higher requirement.
Title
Relates to the minimum cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs; removes the minimum 3.0 or higher requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.75 |
2020-12-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.254 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | substituted for a9750 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.131 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | substituted by s7117 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.254 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07117 (Same As) 2020-12-15 - VETOED MEMO.75