NY A09744 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to qualifications for holding the office of corporation counsel in the city of Amsterdam; provides that a person not living in the city of Amsterdam may hold the office of corporation counsel for such city provided he or she lives in Montgomery county or an adjoining county within the state of New York.
Title
Relates to qualifications for holding the office of corporation counsel in the city of Amsterdam; provides that a person not living in the city of Amsterdam may hold the office of corporation counsel for such city provided he or she lives in Montgomery county or an adjoining county within the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.193 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.92 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | substituted for a9744 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.716 |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s7790 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.92 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07790 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - SIGNED CHAP.193