NY A09738 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for certain death benefits to county fire marshals, supervising fire marshals, fire marshals, assistant fire marshals, assistant chief fire marshals, chief fire marshals and division supervising fire marshals employed by Nassau county.
Title
Provides for certain death benefits to county fire marshals, supervising fire marshals, fire marshals, assistant fire marshals, assistant chief fire marshals, chief fire marshals and division supervising fire marshals employed by Nassau county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-16 | Assembly | vetoed memo.117 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1565 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8584 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.359 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.359 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08584 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9738