NY A09738 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.360
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an additional two percent occupancy tax in the county of Onondaga, raising the overall rate of such tax from five percent to seven percent.
Title
Imposes an additional two percent occupancy tax in the county of Onondaga, raising the overall rate of such tax from five percent to seven percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.360 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.985 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7789 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.91 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.91 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07789 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - signed chap.360