NY A09723 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose an additional one percent sales tax from November 30, 2020 until November 30, 2023.
Title
Extends the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose an additional one percent sales tax from November 30, 2020 until November 30, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07322 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS