NY A09720 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Bath, in Steuben county to adopt and amend local laws imposing a tax on persons occupying a room for hire in any hotel in an amount not to exceed 2% of the per diem rental rate for each room; provides for the expiration and repeal of such provisions on September 1, 2025.
Title
Authorizes the village of Bath, in Steuben county to adopt and amend local laws imposing a tax on persons occupying a room for hire in any hotel in an amount not to exceed 2% of the per diem rental rate for each room; provides for the expiration and repeal of such provisions on September 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.627 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.627 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08625 (Same As) 2022-03-22 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS