NY A09704 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - advanced to third reading cal.882
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - advanced to third reading cal.882
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to loitering for the purpose of engaging in a prostitution offense; makes technical corrections relating thereto.
Title
Repeals provisions relating to loitering for the purpose of engaging in a prostitution offense; makes technical corrections relating thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.882 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | print number 9704a |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08107 (Same As) 2018-05-09 - PRINT NUMBER 8107A