NY A09702 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - approval memo.33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires written comments to be included in reports provided by local social services districts in reports on the death of certain children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires written comments to be included in reports provided by local social services districts in reports on the death of certain children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senateapproval memo.33
2014-12-29Senatesigned chap.544
2014-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1622
2014-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7667
2014-06-09SenateREFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
2014-06-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2014-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.873
2014-05-28Assemblyreported
2014-05-16Assemblyreferred to children and families

Same As/Similar To

S07667 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9702

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback