NY A09697 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8633a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8633a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the nightlife opioid antagonist program to allow certain establishments to apply and receive an opioid antagonist, free of charge, to be administered to patrons, staff or individuals on premises of such establishment in the case of an emergency.
Title
Establishes the nightlife opioid antagonist program to allow certain establishments to apply and receive an opioid antagonist, free of charge, to be administered to patrons, staff or individuals on premises of such establishment in the case of an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8633a |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.709 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | print number 9697a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08633 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.72