NY A09694 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s8884a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the issuance of a temporary permit for a brewer to sell or offer beer at certain locations once per year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the issuance of a temporary permit for a brewer to sell or offer beer at certain locations once per year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30Assemblysubstituted by s8884a
2024-05-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.195
2024-05-28Assemblyrules report cal.195
2024-05-28Assemblyreported
2024-05-22Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-05-16Assemblyprint number 9694a
2024-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to economic development
2024-04-03Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S08884 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.160

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A9694
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09694&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09694
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09694&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09694A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09694&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09694&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09694&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback