NY A09694 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - approval memo.27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - approval memo.27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the imposition of an occupancy tax in the village of Port Chester.
Title
Authorizes the imposition of an occupancy tax in the village of Port Chester.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | Senate | approval memo.27 |
2016-12-31 | Senate | signed chap.509 |
2016-12-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1995 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7152 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.834 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07152 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9694