NY A09691 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-20 - delivered to secretary of state
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-20 - delivered to secretary of state
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends until January 1, 2024 the authority of counties, cities, towns & villages to exclude from their constitutional debt limits indebtedness contracted from the construction and reconstruction of facilities for the conveyance, treatment and disposal of sewage.
Title
Extends until January 1, 2024 the authority of counties, cities, towns & villages to exclude from their constitutional debt limits indebtedness contracted from the construction and reconstruction of facilities for the conveyance, treatment and disposal of sewage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to secretary of state |
2012-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1217 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7554 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.661 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to judiciary |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-03-26 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2012-03-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07554 (Same As) 2012-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9691