NY A09678 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.352
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.352
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an exemption for certain real property in certain counties.
Title
Provides for an exemption for certain real property in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.352 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.829 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7257A |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.237 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.237 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | print number 9678b |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | print number 9678a |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07257 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9678B