NY A09673 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds Truesdale Drive, Nordica Drive, Cedar Lane, and Old Post Road South from Truesdale Drive to Morningside Drive to the Croton-on-Hudson residential parking system.
Title
Adds Truesdale Drive, Nordica Drive, Cedar Lane, and Old Post Road South from Truesdale Drive to Morningside Drive to the Croton-on-Hudson residential parking system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.355 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.355 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08694 (Same As) 2022-03-30 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION