NY A09670 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the provision of incident reports to qualified persons and the manner of delivery of such reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the provision of incident reports to qualified persons and the manner of delivery of such reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2020-03-10Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-03-10Assemblypassed assembly
2020-03-05Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.467
2020-03-03Assemblyreported
2020-02-11Assemblyreported referred to codes
2020-02-04Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S08978 (Same As) 2020-09-16 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback