NY A09670 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disputes between a surrogate and a hospital or individual health care provider; cites when the requirement of a provider to provide life-sustaining treatment following a surrogate's directive does not apply.
Title
Relates to disputes between a surrogate and a hospital or individual health care provider; cites when the requirement of a provider to provide life-sustaining treatment following a surrogate's directive does not apply.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 9670a |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07155 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 7155A