NY A09666 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Glencoma lake, Lincolndale lake, MacGregor lake, Mahopac lake, Secor lake, Shenorock lake, Teakettle Spout lake and Wixon lake as inland waterways.
Title
Designates Glencoma lake, Lincolndale lake, MacGregor lake, Mahopac lake, Secor lake, Shenorock lake, Teakettle Spout lake and Wixon lake as inland waterways.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Katz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | print number 9666a |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | held for consideration in environmental conservation |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07004 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.196