NY A09665 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - print number 9665a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - print number 9665a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deems an application filed with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system by the widow of Lawrence Lakeman as timely filed.
Title
Deems an application filed with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system by the widow of Lawrence Lakeman as timely filed.
Sponsors
Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. Karen McMahon [D] | Asm. William Conrad [D] |
Asm. Patrick Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Assembly | print number 9665a |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04285 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental employees